SB391
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Goicoechea, Hammond, Hutchison, Roberson, Gustavson, Hardy, Settelmeyer

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning the governance structure of and funding methods for community colleges in this State. (BDR S-952)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 452     Amend. No. 952   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 452.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 952.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.