SB392
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Requires reporting by the State Board of Education and school districts concerning gifts and bequests relating to education. (BDR 34-147)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 262.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 01, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 13, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 453     Amend. No. 611   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 453.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 25, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 611.) To printer.

May 18, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 611 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 262.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.