SB398
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kihuen, Diaz, Carrillo

Makes an appropriation to the Nevada Alliance of Boys and Girls Clubs, Inc., for the AfterSchool KidzLit program. (BDR S-1053)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)