SB407
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Woodhouse, Dondero Loop

Revises provisions governing the statewide performance evaluation system for teachers and administrators. (BDR 34-143)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 18, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2013     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Jun 01, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 562     Amend. No. 850     Amend. No. 948   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 562.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 28, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) To printer.

May 29, 2013

May 30, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 01, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 948 concurred in.

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
  • Sections 16 and 23 of this act become effective June 11, 2013. Sections 1 to 15, inclusive, and 16.3 to 22, inclusive, of this act become effective on July 1, 2013.