AB414
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2013.
By: Education

Requires a course of study in health to include, to the extent money is available for this purpose, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator for certain grade levels. (BDR 34-204)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 21, 2013     11:39 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar 27, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Education     May 27, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 29, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 31, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 344     Amend. No. 918   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 22, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 344.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 30, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 918.) To printer.

May 31, 2013

Jun 01, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 918 concurred in.

Jun 02, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.