SB414
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Judiciary

Prohibits transmitting or distributing certain images of bullying involving a child under certain circumstances. (BDR 15-70)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 338.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 09, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 11, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 08, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 340     Amend. No. 663   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 340.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 663.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 663 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 338.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.