AB89
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Kirkpatrick, Horne, Frierson, Hickey, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Cohen, Daly, Diaz, Eisen, Flores, Hardy, Healey, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Swank, Denis, Smith, Kieckhefer, Roberson, Segerblom, Jones, Parks

Authorizes the formation of benefit corporations. (BDR 7-28)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 25, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 07, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 16, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 13, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 13, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 08, 2013

  • Read second time.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 13, 2013

Mar 15, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.
  • Effective January 1, 2014.