Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

77th (2013) Session
Bills Effective July 1, 2014



This list contains those bills which take effect on July 1, 2014, either in part or as a whole.


SB71 Revises provisions governing sentencing of certain criminal offenders and determining eligibility of certain prisoners for parole. (BDR 14-447)
  Effective July 1, 2014.

SB125 Revises provisions relating to rules and regulations of the Nevada Interscholastic Activities Association. (BDR 34-871)
  Sections 3.5 and 4 of this act become effective May 25, 2013. Sections 1, 2 and 3 effective May 25, 2013 for the purpose of adopting regulations and July 1, 2014 for all other purposes.

SB258 Creates the Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Abuse of Children. (BDR 38-192)
  Effective July 1, 2013, and expires by limitation on July 1, 2014.

SB327 Revises provisions relating to health care professions. (BDR 54-772)
  Sections 1 to 8, inclusive, and 10 to 20, inclusive, and 21 of this act become effective June 2, 2013. Section 8 of this act expires by limitation on June 30, 2014. Section 9 of this act becomes effective on July 1, 2014.

SB522 Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2013-2015 biennium. (BDR S-1244)
  Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, and 14 to 28, inclusive, and 29 of this act become effective on July 1, 2013. Section 13 of this act becomes effective on July 1, 2014.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo