AB401 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford, Moore

Authorizes the establishment by district courts of courts of inquiry that may be used to exonerate convicted persons. (BDR 14-101)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 25, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 08, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)