AB436 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Ways and Means

Eliminates longevity payments for state employees. (BDR 23-1157)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 461.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 23, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 14, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 02, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2015     12:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2015   Yea 23,   Nay 19,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 28,   Nay 12,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 920   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

May 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 920.) To printer.

May 28, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.)
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Jun 03, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 461.

Effective June 9, 2015.