AB125 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 06, 2015.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to constructional defects. (BDR 3-588)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 2.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 03, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 11, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes      
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 11, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 13, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 18, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Feb 17, 2015   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Feb 20, 2015   Yea 11,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 7   

Bill History

Feb 06, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 09, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 13, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Feb 17, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.

Feb 18, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 19, 2015

  • Read second time.

Feb 20, 2015

Feb 23, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Feb 24, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Feb 25, 2015

  • Chapter 2.

Effective February 24, 2015.