AB148 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Fiore, Seaman, Dickman, Shelton, Oscarson, Armstrong, Dooling, Ellison, Gardner, Hambrick, Hansen, Jones, Kirner, Moore, O'Neill, Titus, Trowbridge, Wheeler, Woodbury, Gustavson, Goicoechea

Revises provisions governing firearms. (BDR5-242)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 05, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 18, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 27, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 06, 2015   Yea 24,   Nay 15,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 228   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 16, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2015

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 03, 2015

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 228.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2015

Apr 07, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)