AB234 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 06, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford, Hickey, Diaz, Thompson, Flores, Elliot Anderson, Araujo, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Joiner, Kirkpatrick, Neal, Ohrenschall, Sprinkle, Swank, Wheeler, Manendo, Atkinson, Denis, Kihuen, Ford, Harris, Spearman

Enacts provisions related to multicultural education. (BDR 34-102)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 368.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 16, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 08, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 28, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2015   Yea 18,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 407     Amend. No. 798     Amend. No. 878   

Bill History

Mar 06, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 09, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 407.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 798 and 878.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 29, 2015

May 30, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 368.

Effective July 1, 2015.