SB439 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Provides for the permitting and regulation of transportation network companies. (BDR 58-633)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 30, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 09, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 10, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 22, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 29, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 465   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 465.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 20, 2015

  • Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2015

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)