SJR16 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman, Kihuen, Ford, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Smith, Woodhouse

Ratifies the Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. (BDR R-786)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 08, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 10, 2015     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 18, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)