SB463 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-411)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 02, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr 27, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda            Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Education     May 04, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 13, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Education     May 15, 2015     12:13 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 21, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 21, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2015     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 498     Amend. No. 634     Amend. No. 934   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 498.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 21, 2015

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 934.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate.

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 934 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.

Effective July 1, 2015.