SB477 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing the installation of automatic fire sprinkler systems in certain structures. (BDR 22-1110)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 354.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 29, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 01, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 22,   Nay 20,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 385     Amend. No. 738   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 385.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 18, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) To printer.

May 20, 2015

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 738 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 354.

Effective June 4, 2015.