SB492 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing the financial administration of off-highway vehicle titling and registration. (BDR 43-1175)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 482.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 31, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 09, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 25, 2015     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 28, 2015     12:51 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2015     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 37,   Nay 0,   Excused 5,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 812     Amend. No. 1005   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

May 16, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 812.) To printer.

May 18, 2015

May 19, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Transportation and Ways and Means. To committees.

May 29, 2015

  • From Concurrent Committee on Transportation: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1005.) To printer.

May 30, 2015

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Jun 01, 2015

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: None, Excused: 5.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1005 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 482.

Effective July 1, 2015.