AB484 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Ways and Means

Provides for the rolling reissuance of license plates by the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-1179)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 478.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 23, 2015     09:19 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 17, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 22, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2015     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2015   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Reconsideration    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2015   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2015   Yea 17,   Nay 2,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 969   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2015

  • Notice of exemption.

May 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 969.) To printer.

May 28, 2015

May 30, 2015

May 31, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2015

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 478.

Sections 3, 4, 7, 9 to 13, inclusive, and 14 of this act effective June 9, 2015. Sections 1, 2, 5, 6, and 8 of this act effective on July 1, 2015, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2016, for all other purposes.