SB503 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Provides for the creation and implementation of the Breakfast After the Bell Program. (BDR 34-1200)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 544.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 09, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 20, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 20, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr 22, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Apr 28, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 22, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 31, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 30, 2015   Yea 17,   Nay 2,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2015   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 510     Amend. No. 648   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 510.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 27, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 28, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 648.) To printer.

Apr 29, 2015

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 30, 2015

May 01, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 22, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 26, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 27, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2015

May 29, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 544.
  • Effective June 12, 2015, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2015, for all other purposes.