SB508 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing the Nevada Plan. (BDR 34-1184)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 26, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer
  Senate Finance     Apr 24, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 25, 2015     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 29, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2015     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 31, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 27, 2015   Yea 18,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 31,   Nay 9,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 978   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

May 27, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 978.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 31, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2015

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.
  • Sections 2, 4, 5, 7, 9, 12, 14, 16.5, 17, 18, 19, 21, 22, 24, 26 to 29, inclusive, and 31 effective June 11, 2015. Sections 1, 3, 6, 8, 10, 15, 20, 23, 25 and 30 effective July 1, 2016. Sections 11, 13 and 16 effective July 1, 2017.