AB40 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to the State Gaming Control Board. (BDR 41-352)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 274.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 05, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 05, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 20, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 23, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 23, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 07, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 03, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 35   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2015

Apr 03, 2015

Apr 06, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 13, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2015

  • To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 274.

Effective May 29, 2015. Section 1 of this act expires by limitation four years after the effective date of this act.