AB487 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on May 22, 2015.
Emergency Request of
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oscarson, Wheeler, Woodbury, Armstrong, Edwards, Dickman, Dooling, Gardner, Kirner, Moore, O'Neill, Seaman, Silberkraus, Stewart, Titus, Trowbridge

Revises provisions governing firearms. (BDR 5-1279)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     May 26, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 27, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 29, 2015   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 992   

Bill History

May 22, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

May 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

May 28, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 992.) To printer.

May 29, 2015

May 30, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)