AB43 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Transportation

Clarifies confidentiality provisions governing certain documents. (BDR 35-377)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 123.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 05, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 05, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 01, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2015   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 83   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 83.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2015

Apr 14, 2015

Apr 15, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 12, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 13, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 19, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 20, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 123.

Effective May 20, 2015. Sections 6 and 7.5 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2017.