SB83 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Government Affairs

Designates as confidential certain information that is reported to the Division of Internal Audits of the Department of Administration. (BDR 31-288)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 32.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 20, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 27, 2015     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 23, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 30, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 30, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 63   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 27, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 63.) To printer.

Mar 30, 2015

Apr 01, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 24, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 27, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 28, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 29, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 30, 2015

May 01, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 04, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 32.

Effective May 6, 2015.