AB60 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions relating to ethics in government. (BDR 23-309)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 03, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 05, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 09, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 04, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 06, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 514   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 514.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 23, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 07, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2015

May 20, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 21, 2015

  • To enrollment.

May 22, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198.

Effective May 27, 2015.