SB95 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 30, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Revises provisions governing the publication of property tax rolls. (BDR 32-630)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 467.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 10, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 12, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 23, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Taxation     May 14, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 18, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
May 31, 2015 07: 30 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 814     Amend. No. CA7   

Bill History

Jan 30, 2015

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Feb 01, 2015

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read second time.

Mar 18, 2015

Mar 19, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation.
  • To committee.

May 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 21, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 814.) To printer.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 814 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 814 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.

May 29, 2015

  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 01, 2015

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 814 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 02, 2015

  • To printer.

Jun 03, 2015

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 467.

Sections 1 and 2 effective July 1, 2015. Section 1.5 effective July 1, 2016.