SB117 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 01, 2015.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to immunizations. (BDR 34-691)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 30, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 01, 2015

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 27, 2015

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)