SB126 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 09, 2015.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-408)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 19, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 26, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Feb 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 59   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 10, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 23, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 03, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)