AJR4 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Edwards, Armstrong, Oscarson, Dickman, Ellison, Kirner, Ohrenschall, Goicoechea

Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing states to establish daylight saving time as the standard time throughout the calendar year. (BDR R-583)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 29.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 26, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 24, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 29, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 04, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 15, 2015     03:30 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 01, 2015   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 18, 2015   Yea 12,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 11, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 12, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2015

Apr 02, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 16, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2015

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File for next legislative day. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 18, 2015

May 19, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 21, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 29.

Effective May 21, 2015