SB138 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson, Settelmeyer, Fiore, Ellison, Dickman, Jones, Wheeler

Revises provisions governing the forfeiture of property. (BDR 14-222)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 04, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 29, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 08, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     May 13, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     May 14, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 450     Amend. No. 788   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 13, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 450.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 788.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 788 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.

Effective October 1, 2015.