AB162 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford, Wheeler, Ohrenschall, Shelton

Revises provisions governing the use of portable event recording devices by law enforcement. (BDR 23-443)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 09, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 11, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 31, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 03, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 08, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Taxation     May 31, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 268   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 16, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 10, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2015

Apr 21, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 14, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 19, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.

Effective January 1, 2016.