SB28 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Government Affairs

Clarifies provisions governing the fees that may be charged for providing copies of certain public records. (BDR 19-464)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 11, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 04, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)