AB179 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 19, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Flores, Carrillo, Diaz, Elliot Anderson, Araujo, Armstrong, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Dickman, Dooling, Ellison, Gardner, Joiner, Jones, Kirkpatrick, Moore, Munford, Nelson, Ohrenschall, O'Neill, Seaman, Shelton, Silberkraus, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Swank, Thompson, Trowbridge, Denis, Kihuen, Spearman, Manendo

Revises provisions governing personal information. (BDR 52-756)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 55.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 04, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 16, 2015     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 30, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 01, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 24, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 01, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 16, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 05, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 244   

Bill History

Feb 19, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2015

Apr 17, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 01, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2015

May 06, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 13, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 55.

Effective July 1, 2015.