AB191 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 23, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Paul Anderson, Kirkpatrick, Hammond, Roberson

Revises provisions governing taxes on fuels for motor vehicles. (BDR 32-667)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Feb 10, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 10, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 02, 2015     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 09, 2015     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 30, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 429     Amend. No. 686   

Bill History

Feb 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 23, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.

May 16, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 686.) To printer.

May 18, 2015

May 19, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 686 concurred in.

May 30, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.

Sections 2, 16 to 19, inclusive, and 20 of this act effective June 5, 2015. Sections 1, 4, 7, 9, and 12 of this act effective on November 9, 2016, if the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question. Sections 3, 4.5, 6, 7.5, 9.5, 11, 12.5, 14, and 14.5 of this act effective on January 1, 2017, if: (a) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is not approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question; and (b) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to section 17 of this act is approved by a majority of the registered voters in any county in this state voting on the question. Sections 3, 5, 6, 8, 10, 11, 13, 14, and 15 of this act effective on January 1, 2017, if: (a) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question; and (b) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to section 17 of this act is approved by a majority of the registered voters in any county in this state voting on the question.