SB188 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 23, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Revises provisions relating to vehicle collisions. (BDR 43-674)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 317.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 03, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 05, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 14, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 07, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Transportation     May 14, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 10, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2015   Yea 35,   Nay 6,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 808   

Bill History

Feb 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 06, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 09, 2015

  • Read second time.

Mar 10, 2015

Mar 11, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 18, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 808.) To printer.

May 20, 2015

May 21, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 808 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 317.
  • Effective June 1, 2015, for the purpose of adopting regulations or performing any preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes.