SB189 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 24, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Parks, Ford, Segerblom, Spearman, Denis, Kihuen, Manendo

Makes various changes concerning the collection of information relating to the treatment of trauma. (BDR 40-95)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 02, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 04, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 27, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 77   

Bill History

Feb 24, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 09, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 01, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 02, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 03, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)