AB206 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 02, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spiegel, Swank, Carrillo, Joiner, Kirkpatrick, Ohrenschall, Oscarson, Sprinkle, Thompson

Revises provisions relating to certain notices provided to the parent or guardian of a pupil who attends a public school. (BDR 34-740)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 09, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Mar 23, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Mar 31, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Mentioned not agendized
  Senate Education     May 12, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 25, 2015     02:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2015   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 19, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 169     Amend. No. 802   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 03, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 169.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2015

Apr 10, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2015

Apr 15, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 802.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 20, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 802 concurred in.

May 27, 2015

  • To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.