AB221 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 04, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirner

Revises provisions relating to data concerning pupils. (BDR 34-147)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 17, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Mar 20, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Education     Mar 23, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 06, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 31, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 31, 2015     12:33 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 323     Amend. No. 919   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 05, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 323.)
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 323.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 919.) To printer.

May 29, 2015

May 30, 2015

  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 31, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2015

Jun 03, 2015

  • In Assembly.

Jun 04, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.

Effective July 1, 2015.