AB239 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 09, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Elliot Anderson, Ohrenschall, Hansen, Spiegel, Wheeler, Araujo, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Diaz, Flores, Joiner, Neal, Sprinkle, Manendo

Regulates operators of unmanned aerial vehicles in this State. (BDR 44-8)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 24, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 08, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 30, 2015     11:30 AM          Minutes          Re-refer
  Senate Judiciary     May 07, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 11, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 13, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 19, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 362     Amend. No. 640     Amend. No. 746   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 10, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 362.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 23, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Apr 30, 2015

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.

May 19, 2015

May 20, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 746 concurred in.

May 31, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
  • Effective June 2, 2015, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on October 1, 2015, for all other purposes.