SB228 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson

Revises provisions relating to the disclosure of personally identifiable information of a pupil by a school district or public school. (BDR 34-848)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 20, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Education     Mar 23, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 09, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 10, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)