SB232 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2015.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Makes various changes relating to workers' compensation. (BDR 53-987)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 240.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 13, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 20, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 06, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 13, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 307   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 10, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 307.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2015

Apr 15, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 14, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2015

May 20, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 240.

Effective May 27, 2015, for the purposes of adopting any regulations or performing any preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes.