AB266 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 12, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Dickman, Fiore, Jones, Hansen, Moore, Dooling, Ellison, Gardner, Hambrick, Hickey, Nelson, O'Neill, Oscarson, Seaman, Shelton, Titus, Trowbridge, Wheeler

Requires proof of identity for voting. (BDR 24-919)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 17, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 02, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 12, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 13, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 03, 2015

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)