AB303 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Jones, Dickman, Fiore, Moore, Shelton, Armstrong, Ellison, Gardner, Munford, Ohrenschall, Trowbridge, Gustavson

Revises provisions governing academic standards in public schools. (BDR 34-886)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 16, 2015     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 16, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)