SB302 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hammond

Establishes a program by which a child who receives instruction from a certain entity rather than from a public school may receive a grant of money in an amount equal to a certain percentage of the statewide average basic support per-pupil. (BDR 34-567)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 25, 2015     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 26, 2015     03:45 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 28, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 27, 2015   Yea 11,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2015   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 639     Amend. No. 988   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 639.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 27, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 988.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 8, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 29, 2015

May 30, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332.
  • Effective July 1, 2015, for the purposes of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes.