AB386 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Flores, Seaman, Dooling, Carrillo, Kirkpatrick, Dickman, Joiner, O'Neill, Spiegel, Thompson, Titus, Wheeler, Woodbury, Denis, Kihuen

Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 3-921)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 507.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 08, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 547     Amend. No. 641     Amend. No. 712   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 547.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 23, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 712.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 22, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 712 concurred in.

May 31, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 507.

Effective October 1, 2015.