SB398 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Manendo, Parks, Kihuen, Ford, Segerblom, Settelmeyer, Smith, Woodhouse, Bustamante Adams, Flores, Joiner, Thompson

Prohibits the sale or transfer of ivory under certain circumstances. (BDR 52-1022)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)