SB404 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Hammond, Manendo, O'Neill, Silberkraus

Makes certain changes concerning registration of mopeds. (BDR 43-1016)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 02, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 09, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 14, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 413     Amend. No. 887   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 413.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 21, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 887.) To printer.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 887 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Effective June 2, 2015, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and for all other purposes, on January 1, 2017; or the date on which the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles, pursuant to section 15.9 of this act, notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Department to carry out the amendatory provisions of this act, whichever occurs first.