AB408 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Fiore, Shelton, Dooling, Titus, Seaman, Dickman, Ellison, Gardner, Hansen, Jones, Moore, Oscarson, Wheeler, Gustavson

Enacts provisions relating to certain uses of land and the exercise of law enforcement authority in this State. (BDR 26-1060)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 31, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 09, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 8,   Nay 34,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 421   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 595     Amend. No. 642   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 421.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 22, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)