SB405 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Woodhouse, Manendo, Harris, Kihuen, Atkinson, Ford, Roberson, Segerblom, Smith, Spearman, Diaz, Flores, Elliot Anderson, Bustamante Adams, Stewart

Expands the program of Zoom schools and the provision of programs and services to children who are limited English proficient in certain other schools. (BDR S-887)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 335.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 09, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 24, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2015     01:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 19, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2015     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 14, 2015   Yea 18,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 513     Amend. No. 706   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 513.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 12, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 13, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 706.) To printer.

May 14, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 20, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 21, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 335.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.